U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Sahr v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • October 04, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 27, 2022: [Errata]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 27, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice - Other]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 16, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 27, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 21, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.