U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Rhodd v. Skinner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Report Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice - Other]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2022: [Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • January 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.