U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02018
  • Case Name: Larson v. Buchanan County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.