U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Mossman et al v. United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Certify Class]
  • September 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 03, 2021: [Stay]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 30, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.