U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Grommet v. Mitchell Family Funeral Home et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.