U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Opitz v. Conagra Brands, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 28, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 27, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 12, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 07, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.