U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-01005
  • Case Name: Carroll et al v. Flexsteel Industries, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Certify Class]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 08, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 03, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.