U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Tutson v. Greenwalt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 27, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 14, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 11, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.