U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Beukenhorst v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • August 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.