U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Hommer v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Remand]
  • January 25, 2022: [Remand]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.