U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Bonar et al v. Sam's Club
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 09, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 12, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.