U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Cochran v. Gilcrest Jewett Lumber Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.