U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Outlaw v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Case Ready for Decision]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.