U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Armstrong v. Luyties et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 13, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.