U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Villalobos Guardado v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.