U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund et al v. MPCC, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 03, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 14, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 13, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.