U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Yoder et al v. Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • October 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 12, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 05, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Seal]
  • July 28, 2021: [Seal]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 15, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2021: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.