U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02001
  • Case Name: Reicksview Farms, LLC v. Kiehne et al see Order at [16] re deadlines once summary judgment motion filed
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.