U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00034
  • Case Name: General Star Indemnity Company v. Berd Electric, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 13, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • May 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 21, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 12, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 12, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.