U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Collins v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 27, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.