U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Givaudan, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • September 08, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 04, 2021: [Transcript]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.