U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Luce v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 28, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 26, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 16, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.