U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Ronnau v. Fort Madison State Penitentiary
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Statement]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • June 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • April 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.