U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Welch v. Mamadou et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 04, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 20, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.