U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Kuehl et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 21, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.