U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Cassell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • August 16, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • August 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • July 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.