U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Transfreight Logistics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • January 17, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • January 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 06, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 06, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • August 05, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • June 07, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.