U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Hamby v. Baldwin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • May 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.