U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Lawrence v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • January 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.