U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Young v. Sentinel Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • July 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.