U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Kasdorf v. Renaissance Transport, LTD.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Stipulation]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • June 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 18, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 28, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.