U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Lithia MBDM, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 18, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.