U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Luzadder v. MRS BPO, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.