U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.