U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Nichols et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 16, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • February 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sealed Document]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 30, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 14, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 03, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.