U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Boone et al v. Livesay et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Alter Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [In Limine]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 01, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 31, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 11, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.