U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Schuler Farms Co. v. E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Sealed Document]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • April 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • August 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 27, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 20, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 14, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 14, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 23, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Intervene]
  • June 10, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 26, 2021: [Intervene]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 17, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 06, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Statement]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.