U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Krier v. Gosnell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 03, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 29, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2022: [Compel]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Brief /Other]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sanctions]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 01, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 27, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 16, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 07, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 07, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 17, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 17, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 12, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 03, 2021: [TRO]
  • November 03, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 03, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 17, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 16, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2021: [Compel]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2021: [Jury Demand]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Compel]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 17, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • May 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2021: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.