U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Lozano v. Entzel
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 02, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reopen Case]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.