U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Cabrera Mendez v. Echeverria et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • May 17, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 13, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 15, 2022: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 08, 2022: [Statement]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 08, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 24, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • March 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2022: [Compel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice - Other]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 09, 2022: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 12, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 30, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • September 29, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • September 29, 2021: [Statement]
  • September 24, 2021: [Leave]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 14, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.