U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Urbandale Best, LLC et al v. R&R Real Estate Investors, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.