U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Adong v. Hagner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 25, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2021: [Exhibits Receipt]
  • May 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 21, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 21, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 21, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 21, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 19, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 18, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 17, 2021: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • May 17, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 17, 2021: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 14, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Statement]
  • May 12, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 12, 2021: [Exhibit List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.