U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Operating Engineers Local #234 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Calacci Construction Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
  • December 16, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment (Sealed)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Writ Issued]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Writ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • November 15, 2021: [Writ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • October 01, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Default Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 23, 2021: [Default Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.