U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00008
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cisco et al DEF St James allowed to submit filings electronically. Clerk's Office to serve St James via email--AT FINAL JUDGMENT SEE #88 ORDER TERMING DFTS USFG AND TBE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Default Entry]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Default Entry]
  • September 08, 2021: [Default Entry]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Withdraw]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 11, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.