U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Northcutt v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 26, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • November 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.