U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Murtha v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • May 17, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.