U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Jones v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.