U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Mosell v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 27, 2022: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 21, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • July 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 27, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.