U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Flanagan et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 06, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 06, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • August 02, 2021: [Joinder]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 14, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 22, 2021: [Leave]
  • June 16, 2021: [Errata]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 08, 2021: [Leave to File]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 26, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 26, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 25, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.