U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Kimberley et al v. Crop Risk Services, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 17, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 25, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 23, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 27, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 24, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.